TN SB0377 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires citizenship status to be proven prior to registration to vote and requires certain procedures to ensure identity and citizenship status prior to voting. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, requires citizenship status to be proven prior to registration to vote and requires certain procedures to ensure identity and citizenship status prior to voting. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | Withdrawn. | |
2012-02-13 | Recalled from S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2011-03-18 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Govt. Com. | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-07 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0393 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-09 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0377&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0377.pdf |