TN HB0393 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-09 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires citizenship status to be proven prior to registration to vote and requires certain procedures to ensure identity and citizenship status prior to voting. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires citizenship status to be proven prior to registration to vote and requires certain procedures to ensure identity and citizenship status prior to voting. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-09 Withdrawn.
2011-03-02 Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c S&LG Sub-committee of State & Local Government Committee
2011-02-23 Placed on s/c cal General Sub of S&LG for 3/2/2011
2011-02-16 Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
2011-02-10 P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee
2011-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-08 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0377 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-13 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback