TN SB0368 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts contractors and subcontractors from the sales or use tax on construction materials if the materials are purchased by a local education agency and are used in local education agency construction, in same manner contractors of churches and private, nonprofit colleges and universities are so exempt. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-209.
Title
As introduced, exempts contractors and subcontractors from the sales or use tax on construction materials if the materials are purchased by a local education agency and are used in local education agency construction, in same manner contractors of churches and private, nonprofit colleges and universities are so exempt. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-209.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ neutral recommendation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0369 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee