TN HB0369 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts contractors and subcontractors from the sales or use tax on construction materials if the materials are purchased by a local education agency and are used in local education agency construction, in same manner contractors of churches and private, nonprofit colleges and universities are so exempt. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-209.
Title
As introduced, exempts contractors and subcontractors from the sales or use tax on construction materials if the materials are purchased by a local education agency and are used in local education agency construction, in same manner contractors of churches and private, nonprofit colleges and universities are so exempt. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-209.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0368 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-09 - Deferred to Summer Study