TN SB0345 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the expiration date for the ground ambulance provider assessment from June 30, 2021, to June 30, 2022; requires, if the quarterly transport data is not adequate or available for the calculation of medicaid ambulance provider assessments, that the bureau of TennCare use total transports submitted to the office of emergency medical services for calendar year 2020, instead of using such data for calendar year 2019. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 7; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 7; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to an assessment on ground ambulance service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective date(s) 04/13/2021 | |
2021-04-21 | Pub. Ch. 122 | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0052) |
2021-03-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0017) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/11/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. 2-24-21 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0461 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 122