TN HB0461 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the expiration date for the ground ambulance provider assessment from June 30, 2021, to June 30, 2022; requires, if the quarterly transport data is not adequate or available for the calculation of medicaid ambulance provider assessments, that the bureau of TennCare use total transports submitted to the office of emergency medical services for calendar year 2020, instead of using such data for calendar year 2019. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 7; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 7; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to an assessment on ground ambulance service providers.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 122 | |
2021-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0345 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021