TN SB0317 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows sale of wine in retail food stores where sales of alcoholic beverages for on premises consumption has been approved but does not allow sale of wine in retail food stores where sales of alcoholic beverages in retail package stores has been approved. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 1 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, allows sale of wine in retail food stores where sales of alcoholic beverages for on premises consumption has been approved but does not allow sale of wine in retail food stores where sales of alcoholic beverages in retail package stores has been approved. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 1 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0559 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-16 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0317&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0317.pdf |