TN SB0316 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-31 - Pub. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-31 - Pub. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends from June 30, 2005, to June 30, 2011, the date until which the funding board has discretion to sell bonds at private sale. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 9 and previously enacted bond acts.
Title
As enacted, extends from June 30, 2005, to June 30, 2011, the date until which the funding board has discretion to sell bonds at private sale. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 9 and previously enacted bond acts.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-18 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Pub. Ch. 4 | |
2009-03-31 | Effective date(s) 03/10/09 | |
2009-03-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-03-05 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-03-04 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-03-04 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-03-03 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-03-02 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-02 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-02-23 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-02-23 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-02-22 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 02/23/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 02/18/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0418 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4