TN SB0305 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that nutritional standards adopted by the state board of education do not prohibit LEAs and schools from offering whole milk as a food choice for students. - Amends TCA Title 43; Title 44; Title 49 and Title 53.
Title
As introduced, specifies that nutritional standards adopted by the state board of education do not prohibit LEAs and schools from offering whole milk as a food choice for students. - Amends TCA Title 43; Title 44; Title 49 and Title 53.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0415 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-06 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee