TN SB0302 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 759
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 759
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows certain part-time and seasonal adventure tourism jobs, with or without minimum health care, created in adventure tourism districts on or after July 1, 2017, to be counted as half a job for purposes of allowing the employer to qualify for the jobs tax credit against franchise and excise taxes. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 11, Part 2 and Title 67.
Title
As enacted, allows certain part-time and seasonal adventure tourism jobs, with or without minimum health care, created in adventure tourism districts on or after July 1, 2017, to be counted as half a job for purposes of allowing the employer to qualify for the jobs tax credit against franchise and excise taxes. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 11, Part 2 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 759 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2016 | |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2016-04-04 | House | Am. tabled. (Amendment 3 - HA1130) |
2016-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1039) |
2016-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0180) |
2016-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0911) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee w/recommend |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1194 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 759