TN SB0279 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to study the feasibility of creating a state gold depository and to report its findings to the speakers of the senate and house of representatives no later than January 1, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 56 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 56 and Title 67, relative to a gold depository.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-11SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-05-04HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-05-04HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-04-08HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-04-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-05SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/5/2021
2021-03-30SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0353 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback