TN HB0353 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the Tennessee advisory commission on intergovernmental relations (TACIR) to study the feasibility of creating a state gold depository and to report its findings to the speakers of the senate and house of representatives no later than January 1, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 56 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48; Title 56 and Title 67, relative to a gold depository.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-05-03HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
2021-04-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to TACIR Study Calendar
2021-04-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-06HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-04-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-31HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-23HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-23HouseRef. to Commerce Committee -- Finance, Ways, & Means
2021-02-10HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0279 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-17 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback