TN SB0276 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the status of the student representative on state university boards to a voting member rather than a nonvoting member; establishes a selection process for the student representative. - Amends TCA Section 49-8-201.
Title
As introduced, changes the status of the student representative on state university boards to a voting member rather than a nonvoting member; establishes a selection process for the student representative. - Amends TCA Section 49-8-201.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Education Committee Ayes 3, Nays 6 PNV 0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Failed in Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0343 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-12 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.