TN SB0254 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the Tennessee consolidated retirement system, board of trustees, June 30, 2019; revises provisions governing certain nominating authorities; requires that TCRS trustees who do not serve on the board in an ex officio capacity be removed by their appointing authority if they miss more than 50 percent of the required quarterly meetings. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 8, Chapter 34, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the Tennessee consolidated retirement system, board of trustees, June 30, 2019; revises provisions governing certain nominating authorities; requires that TCRS trustees who do not serve on the board in an ex officio capacity be removed by their appointing authority if they miss more than 50 percent of the required quarterly meetings. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 8, Chapter 34, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Pub. Ch. 35 | |
2015-04-01 | Effective date(s) 03/27/2015 | |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment 1 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0327 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 35