TN SB0241 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes provisions regarding the Tennessee economic council on women, which ceased to exist June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 38-6-114; Section 50-2-207 and Section 68-1-1803.
Title
As enacted, deletes provisions regarding the Tennessee economic council on women, which ceased to exist June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 38-6-114; Section 50-2-207 and Section 68-1-1803.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 326 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 0, PNV 5 |
2017-05-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/8/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0677 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326