TN HB0677 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes provisions regarding the Tennessee economic council on women, which ceased to exist June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 38-6-114; Section 50-2-207 and Section 68-1-1803.
Title
As enacted, deletes provisions regarding the Tennessee economic council on women, which ceased to exist June 30, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 38-6-114; Section 50-2-207 and Section 68-1-1803.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 326 | |
2017-05-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0241 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 326