TN SB0214 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that the background investigations for a prospective judicial appointment be completed within 90 days. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 16 and Title 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that the background investigations for a prospective judicial appointment be completed within 90 days. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 4; Title 16 and Title 17.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-09SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
2013-04-03SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
2013-04-03SenateAction Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/9/2013
2013-04-03SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/3/2013
2013-04-02SenateAction Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/3/2013
2013-03-27SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
2013-03-26SenateAction Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/2/2013
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
2013-01-31SenateP2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-28SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0363 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-28 - Held on desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback