TN SB0210 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that licensed installers of manufactured homes are only liable for repairs to foundation or support structure of that manufactured home for one year after the date of installation. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 126, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, specifies that licensed installers of manufactured homes are only liable for repairs to foundation or support structure of that manufactured home for one year after the date of installation. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 126, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/12/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0110 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Business and Utilities Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0210&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0210.pdf |