TN SB0185 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 377
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the Nursing Home Assessment Trust Fund by one year, to terminate on June 30, 2018, and revises certain long-term care provisions. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, extends the Nursing Home Assessment Trust Fund by one year, to terminate on June 30, 2018, and revises certain long-term care provisions. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 377 | |
2017-05-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0549) |
2017-05-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0298) |
2017-05-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0318) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0495) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4-25-17 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0142 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 377