TN SB0171 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 188
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 188
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits an insurance company from charging a premium for any individual determined to be an independent contractor; requires additional defense costs and loss adjustment costs be reported to the commissioner of commerce and insurance as supplementary rate and loss costs information. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, prohibits an insurance company from charging a premium for any individual determined to be an independent contractor; requires additional defense costs and loss adjustment costs be reported to the commissioner of commerce and insurance as supplementary rate and loss costs information. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Pub. Ch. 188 | |
2015-04-30 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2015 | |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0250) |
2015-04-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-06 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0230) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0558 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 188