TN HB0558 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 188
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 188
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits an insurance company from charging a premium for any individual determined to be an independent contractor; requires additional defense costs and loss adjustment costs be reported to the commissioner of commerce and insurance as supplementary rate and loss costs information. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, prohibits an insurance company from charging a premium for any individual determined to be an independent contractor; requires additional defense costs and loss adjustment costs be reported to the commissioner of commerce and insurance as supplementary rate and loss costs information. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 188 | |
2015-04-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0171 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 188
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0558&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0558.pdf |