TN SB0155 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits state and local governmental entities and officials from adopting or enacting sanctuary policies; authorizes residents of this state and members of the general assembly to submit complaints to the attorney general and reporter; provides that violations will subject applicable entities to ineligibility of state moneys. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 9.
Title
As introduced, prohibits state and local governmental entities and officials from adopting or enacting sanctuary policies; authorizes residents of this state and members of the general assembly to submit complaints to the attorney general and reporter; provides that violations will subject applicable entities to ineligibility of state moneys. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0271 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-30 - Sponsor(s) Added.