TN HB0271 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: House State Government Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: House State Government Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits state and local governmental entities and officials from adopting or enacting sanctuary policies; authorizes residents of this state and members of the general assembly to submit complaints to the attorney general and reporter; provides that violations will subject applicable entities to ineligibility of state moneys. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 9.
Title
As introduced, prohibits state and local governmental entities and officials from adopting or enacting sanctuary policies; authorizes residents of this state and members of the general assembly to submit complaints to the attorney general and reporter; provides that violations will subject applicable entities to ineligibility of state moneys. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0155 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee