TN SB0152 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-20 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from July 31 to August 15 the date by which the department of education must submit an annual report on the outcomes of the parent-teacher engagement pilot program to the education committee of the senate and the education administration committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0177 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-21 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.