TN SB0113 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the Access Tennessee Act of 2006; limits coverage under the Act to those persons enrolled prior to April 22, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 29.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to the Access Tennessee Act of 2006; limits coverage under the Act to those persons enrolled prior to April 22, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7, Part 29.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Pub. Ch. 185 | |
2015-04-30 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2015 | |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-04-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0152) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/17/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0102 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 185