TN SB0076 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission to June 30, 2023; requires the commission to report back to the government operations committee no later than December 31, 2021, to update the committee on its progress in addressing the committee’s concerns about the commission's answers to questions submitted to it by the division of audit. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22, relative to the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0297 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback