TN HB0297 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission to June 30, 2023; requires the commission to report back to the government operations committee no later than December 31, 2021, to update the committee on its progress in addressing the committee’s concerns about the commission's answers to questions submitted to it by the division of audit. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22, relative to the state textbook and instructional materials quality commission.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 159 | |
2021-04-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/15/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0076 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-30 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021