TN SB0060 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 437
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 437
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a new circuit court judge position in the 19th judicial district, with the position to be filled by appointment of the governor. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, creates a new circuit court judge position in the 19th judicial district, with the position to be filled by appointment of the governor. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Pub. Ch. 437 | |
2015-05-26 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2015 | |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/24/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0055 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 437