TN SB0048 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 161
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, further clarifies the definition of "analogue controlled substance" and adds new drugs and compounds to list of synthetic cannabinoids. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, further clarifies the definition of "analogue controlled substance" and adds new drugs and compounds to list of synthetic cannabinoids. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-26 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24SenateComp. became Pub. Ch. 161
2013-04-01SenateAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0262)
2013-04-01SenateComp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
2013-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/1/2013
2013-03-26SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
2013-01-30SenateP2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2013-01-28SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-10SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0012 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 161

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback