TN SB0023 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-17 - Refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-17 - Refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, names a segment of State Route 104 in Dyer County as the "Harold Holt Highway."
Title
As introduced, names a segment of State Route 104 in Dyer County as the "Harold Holt Highway."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0028 (Crossfiled) 2015-01-17 - Ref. to Transportation Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0023&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0023.pdf |