TN SB0009 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Reset to 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes Knox County and Knoxville to prohibit, by local ordinance, smoking on the grounds of any playground owned or operated by the local government. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes Knox County and Knoxville to prohibit, by local ordinance, smoking on the grounds of any playground owned or operated by the local government. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateReset to 2020
2019-05-02SenateConference Committee report adopted, Ayes 27, Nays 3
2019-05-02HouseConf. comm. appointed.( Staples, Ramsey, Moon, Whitson)
2019-05-02SenateConference Committee appointed. (Briggs, Johnson, Yarbro)
2019-05-02SenateSenate refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
2019-05-02HouseH. refused to recede from am. no. 1
2019-05-02HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/19
2019-05-01SenateSenate refused to concur in amendment 1
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 5/1/2019
2019-04-30SenateRecommended non-concur in House Amendment 1, refer to Senate Clerk's Desk
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-29SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Commerce & Labor Comm. 4/30/19
2019-04-24SenateRe-refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-22HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 64, Nays 25, PNV 5
2019-04-15HouseReset on cal. for 4/22/2019
2019-04-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0058)
2019-04-15HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-02-14HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-02-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-02-11SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0004)
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/11/2019
2019-02-05SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/5/2019
2019-01-19SenateRefer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2019-01-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, Held on desk pending committee appointments
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-12-13SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0009 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback