TN HB0009 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes local governments to prohibit, by local resolution or ordinance adopted by two-thirds vote, smoking on the grounds of any playground owned or operated by the local government. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As enacted, authorizes local governments to prohibit, by local resolution or ordinance adopted by two-thirds vote, smoking on the grounds of any playground owned or operated by the local government. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 529 | |
2019-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2019-01-10 | House | Ref. to Local Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2019-01-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-12-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0009 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Pub. Ch. 529