TN SB0006 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Racial Profiling Prevention Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 1 and Section 49-7-118.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Racial Profiling Prevention Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 1 and Section 49-7-118.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 335 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2015 | |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0307) |
2015-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-12 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment 1 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/5/2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/17/2015 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/17/2015 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/10/2015 |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0057 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 335