TN HB0057 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Racial Profiling Prevention Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 1 and Section 49-7-118.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Racial Profiling Prevention Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 1 and Section 49-7-118.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 335 | |
2015-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-13 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2015-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-16 | House | Re-ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | House | Ref. to Education Instruction & Programs--Criminal |
2015-01-17 | House | P2C held on desk pending appointment of standing committees |
2015-01-16 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0006 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 335
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0057&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0057.pdf |