TN HJR0800 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tennessee Tree Day, March 21, 2020
Title
Tennessee Tree Day, March 21, 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-02-06 | House | Adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/6/20 |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |