TN HJR0776 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Herbert Q. Groce
Title
Herbert Q. Groce
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-02-15 | House | Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2-15-18 |
2018-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |