TN HJR0687 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
June 27, 2018, Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day; June 2018, Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month
Title
June 27, 2018, Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day; June 2018, Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. David Alexander [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-05 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2018-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | Filed for intro. |