TN HJR0674 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Def. to Summer Study in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-03 - Def. to Summer Study in State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the office of legislative administration to establish and encourages members of the 113th General Assembly and legislative employees to participate in a race relations and discrimination and age-based discrimination in the workplace training program.
Title
A RESOLUTION to urge the Office of Legislative Administration to develop and implement a race relations and discrimination and age-based discrimination in the workplace training program and to encourage members of the 113th General Assembly and legislative employees to participate in a race relations and discrimination and age-based discrimination in the workplace training program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Def. to Summer Study in State Government Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-04-21 | House | Filed for introduction |