TN HJR0582 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 67-23)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Iyalode Nkechi Kianga Ajanaku

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Iyalode Nkechi Kianga Ajanaku

Sponsors

Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Raumesh Akbari [D]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]
Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. JoAnne Favors [D]Rep. Brenda Gilmore [D]Rep. G Hardaway [D]
Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Johnnie Turner [D]
Rep. Harry Brooks [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Roger Kane [R]
Rep. Eddie Smith [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. David Alexander [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]
Rep. Kevin Brooks [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]
Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. Jim Coley [R]
Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Barry Doss [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D]Rep. John Forgety [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]
Rep. Tilman Goins [R]Rep. Marc Gravitt [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Beth Harwell [R]
Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Sherry Jones [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Ron Lollar [R]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Judd Matheny [R]Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R]Rep. Gerald McCormick [R]
Rep. Steve McDaniel [R]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]
Rep. Joe Pitts [D]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]
Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Courtney Rogers [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]
Rep. Charles Sargent [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]
Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]
Rep. Dawn White [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]
Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Timothy Wirgau [R]

Roll Calls

2018-01-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-29 Signed by Governor.
2018-01-25HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-01-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-01-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-01-24HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-01-22SenateConcurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2018-01-18SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 1/22/2018
2018-01-17SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-01-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-01-10HouseAdopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-01-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-09HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/10/18
2017-08-04HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback