TN HJR0551 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the department of education to conduct another stakeholder survey that permits stakeholders to express their honest and frank opinions about the Teacher Educator Acceleration Model (TEAM) and to suggest additional changes and refinements to TEAM to improve the evaluation model.
Title
Directs the department of education to conduct another stakeholder survey that permits stakeholders to express their honest and frank opinions about the Teacher Educator Acceleration Model (TEAM) and to suggest additional changes and refinements to TEAM to improve the evaluation model.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-04-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-16 | House | Adopted as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2014-04-16 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1312) |
2014-04-16 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1000) |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-16 | House | Filed for intro. |