TN HJR0264 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Tracie M. Hill, Hawkins County's Teacher of the Year for Church Hill Intermediate School
Title
Tracie M. Hill, Hawkins County's Teacher of the Year for Church Hill Intermediate School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-28 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-04-28 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-04-28 | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-25 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-04-21 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-04-21 | Adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2 | |
2011-04-18 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 4/21/11 | |
2011-04-18 | Filed for intro. |