TN HJR0155 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 171
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 171
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Hal Bynum, University of Tennessee at Martin Advisory Board
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Hal Bynum to the advisory board for the University of Tennessee at Martin.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 171 |
2023-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |