TN HJR0114 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorates Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease Awareness Month in Tennessee.
Title
Commemorates Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease Awareness Month in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-03-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-02 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2015-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-26 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 3/2/15 |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed for intro. |