TN HJR0114 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
National FFA Week, February 21-28, 2009
Title
National FFA Week, February 21-28, 2009
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-03-17 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-03-17 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-03-17 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-03-17 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-03-16 | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-13 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 03/16/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Rec. for concur by S. C,L&A Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-23 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-02-23 | R/S Adopted Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2009-02-19 | R/S Held on desk. | |
2009-02-19 | Filed for intro. |