TN HJR0102 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Failed in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to Article XI, Section 5 of the Constitution of Tennessee, to allow for bingo games conducted by 501(c)(3) or 501(c)(19) organizations to meet a charitable, not for profit, or community service purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes an amendment to Article XI, Section 5 of the Constitution of Tennessee, to allow for bingo games conducted by 501(c)(3) or 501(c)(19) organizations to meet a charitable, not for profit, or community service purpose.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseFailed in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., ref. to State Committee
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback