TN HJR0099 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Ron Ramsey, East Tennessee State University Board of Trustees
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Ron Ramsey of Blountville to the state university board of East Tennessee State University.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-23 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 132 |
2023-03-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-20 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2023-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., ref. to Education Administration |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0099&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HJR0099.pdf |