TN HB9008 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Public Health Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Public Health Committee of Extraordinary Session III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the appointing authority for county health officers and county health directors from the commissioner of health to the county mayor; requires the commissioner to concur in the mayor's appointment; requires county health departments to comply with the direction and rules of the commissioner of health. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 58; Title 68, Chapter 2 and Chapter 550 of the Public Acts of 2021.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 58; Title 68, Chapter 2 and Chapter 550 of the Public Acts of 2021, relative to local health authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Public Health Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-28 | House | Placed on cal. Public Health Committee of Extraordinary Session III for 10/28/2021 |
2021-10-28 | House | P2C, ref. to Public Health Committee of Extraordinary Session III |
2021-10-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-10-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB9084 (Crossfiled) 2021-10-28 - Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 10/28/2021