TN HB7003 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, excludes data generated by state assessments administered in the 2020-2021 school year, and data generated by alternative growth models used by LEAs in the 2020-2021 school year to evaluate teachers in non-tested grades and subjects, from certain accountability determinations; revises certain tenure eligibility requirements to account for the unavailability of data due to the cancellation of TCAP tests as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1, relative to accountability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2
2021-01-21HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-01-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar
2021-01-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session for 1/21/2021
2021-01-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-20HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations of Extraordinary Session for 1/20/2021
2021-01-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Government Operations of Extraordinary Session
2021-01-20HousePlaced on cal. Education 345 of Extraordinary Session for 1/20/2021
2021-01-20HouseP2C, ref. to Education 345 Committee -- Government Operations Committee for Review
2021-01-19HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB7001 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Pub. Ch. 2

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback