TN SB7001 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Effective date(s) 02/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Effective date(s) 02/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, excludes data generated by state assessments administered in the 2020-2021 school year, and data generated by alternative growth models used by LEAs in the 2020-2021 school year to evaluate teachers in non-tested grades and subjects, from certain accountability determinations; revises certain tenure eligibility requirements to account for the unavailability of data due to the cancellation of TCAP tests as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3; Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6; Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1, relative to accountability.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Effective date(s) 02/03/2021 | |
2021-02-09 | Pub. Ch. 2 | |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-01-26 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 71, Nays 17, PNV 0 |
2021-01-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 5 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 1/21/2021 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 1/20/2021 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB7003 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 2