TN HB3620 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a new misdemeanor offense for a person who applies for employment with the intent to cause economic damage to the employer by recording on the premises of the employer and releasing such recordings to a third party. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, creates a new misdemeanor offense for a person who applies for employment with the intent to cause economic damage to the employer by recording on the premises of the employer and releasing such recordings to a third party. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 50.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee | |
2012-04-10 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee of Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 4/10/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 4/11/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Mtg. Cancelled Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 3/28/12 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Action Def. in s/c C&EA Subcommittee to 3/14/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal C&EA Subcommittee for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Assigned to s/c C&EA Subcommittee | |
2012-02-01 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employee Affairs Committee--Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3460 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-16 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB3620&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB3620.pdf |